U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Newman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 08, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 03, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 02, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 02, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 02, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 03, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • May 01, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 02, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 10, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 08, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 08, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 15, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 08, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 24, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 29, 2016: [Consent]
  • April 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 20, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 20, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 20, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 20, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Text Order]
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 04, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Request]
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 24, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 24, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 24, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 24, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 24, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 24, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 24, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 24, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 23, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 23, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.