U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ghost
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 06, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 12, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 12, 2016: [Waiver]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 03, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 03, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 03, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 05, 2016: [Request]
  • January 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 31, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 31, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 31, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 31, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 31, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 30, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 30, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 30, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 30, 2015: [Arrest]
  • December 30, 2015: [Bail Report]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.