U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Long Soldier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 21, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 13, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 02, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2015: [Waiver]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Request]
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 24, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 24, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 24, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 24, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 24, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 24, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 24, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 24, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 23, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 23, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 23, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.