U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • February 22, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Exhibits]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 02, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 02, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 01, 2018: [Sentencing]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 06, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2018: [Extend]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 17, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 14, 2017: [Supplement]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 08, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 08, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 08, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Extend]
  • June 14, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 23, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 26, 2016: [Transcript]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • April 06, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 29, 2016: [Continue]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 24, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 24, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 24, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • February 23, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • February 16, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 10, 2016: [Extend]
  • February 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 01, 2016: [Extend]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 25, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 22, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 20, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 20, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 20, 2016: [Furlough]
  • January 19, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 19, 2016: [Extend]
  • January 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 12, 2016: [Suppress]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • December 15, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 15, 2015: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Request]
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 23, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 23, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 23, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 23, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 23, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 23, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.