U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez-Prado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Judgment - Amended]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 07, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 07, 2016: [Sentencing]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 21, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 17, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 17, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 29, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Waiver]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Response]
  • November 19, 2015: [Request]
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 18, 2015: [Oral Order]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.