U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gilbert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 29, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 16, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 06, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 30, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 28, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 28, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 11, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 21, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 17, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 17, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 26, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 21, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 21, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 20, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • July 11, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 17, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 17, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 15, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 14, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • June 13, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order]
  • May 18, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 18, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 18, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 18, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • May 17, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 13, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 11, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 11, 2016: [Furlough]
  • May 06, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 06, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order]
  • March 28, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Request]
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 20, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 20, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 19, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 19, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.