U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dale
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 23, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 15, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 13, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 13, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 09, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 03, 2018: [Certificate]
  • May 02, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 07, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 07, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 20, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 16, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • October 13, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 17, 2017: [Furlough]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 01, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 18, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Furlough]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 17, 2017: [Furlough]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 09, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 07, 2017: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • June 07, 2017: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 07, 2017: [Request for Warrant]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 20, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 20, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 06, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 06, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 30, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 29, 2016: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Warrant]
  • November 29, 2016: [Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • November 29, 2016: [Ex Parte Motion for Warrant]
  • November 28, 2016: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 28, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 28, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • September 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 08, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 16, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 03, 2016: [Request]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 02, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 02, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 02, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.