U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin-Padilla
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 08, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 27, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 21, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 18, 2015: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 14, 2015: [Discovery]
  • December 02, 2015: [Response]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 25, 2015: [Request]
  • November 24, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 24, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 24, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 24, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 24, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 24, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 24, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 24, 2015: [Interpreter Needed]
  • November 24, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 18, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.