U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-50108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tobacco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 03, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 20, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 18, 2015: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 18, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 18, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.