U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:05-cr-40077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 19, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 19, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 14, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • December 14, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 09, 2015: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2015: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2015: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 20, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 20, 2015: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 20, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 19, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.