U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bednarz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • November 08, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 26, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • August 26, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 26, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 06, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 01, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 01, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 18, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 29, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 29, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 29, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 29, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Extend]
  • March 07, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 26, 2018: [Extend]
  • January 16, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • September 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 27, 2017: [Furlough]
  • September 18, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice]
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Notice]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 13, 2017: [Transcript]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Text Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Ex Parte Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Competency Evaluation]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 15, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Reconsideration]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 08, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 29, 2016: [Continue]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 21, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 21, 2016: [Arrest]
  • June 20, 2016: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Warrant]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 13, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 10, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 03, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 08, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 25, 2015: [Waiver]
  • November 23, 2015: [Request]
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • November 23, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 20, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 20, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 20, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 19, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 19, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 19, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 19, 2015: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 19, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.