U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 26, 2018: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • November 15, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 15, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • November 15, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • November 15, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.