U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-10004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Steele
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 18, 2018: [USCA Order]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 13, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 16, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 11, 2017: [Transcript]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • July 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 26, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 26, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 20, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 20, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 01, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 31, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 25, 2015: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.