U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guide
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 25, 2019: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 06, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 20, 2017: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • July 19, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 19, 2017: [Letter]
  • July 19, 2017: [Transcript]
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 05, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 05, 2017: [Transcript]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 30, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 30, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 30, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 27, 2017: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 27, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 27, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 27, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 12, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 12, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
  • June 09, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 31, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • March 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 24, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 24, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 24, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • March 24, 2017: [Verdict]
  • March 24, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • March 24, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 24, 2017: [Jury List]
  • March 24, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • March 24, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 20, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 20, 2017: [Leave to]
  • March 20, 2017: [In Limine]
  • March 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice]
  • March 16, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 14, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 13, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice]
  • March 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 01, 2017: [Brief]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 24, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 16, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 16, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • February 09, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • February 08, 2017: [Seal Existing Document]
  • February 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 07, 2017: [Extend]
  • February 07, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice]
  • February 07, 2017: [In Limine]
  • February 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [Status Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 27, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 07, 2015: [Discovery]
  • December 02, 2015: [Response]
  • December 01, 2015: [Request]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 30, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 30, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 30, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 30, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 30, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 30, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 27, 2015: [Arrest - Other District]
  • November 27, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 27, 2015: [Interpreter Needed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.