U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Touche
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 16, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 16, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 11, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 04, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 19, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 25, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 03, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 01, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 01, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2015: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 01, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 01, 2015: [Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • December 01, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 01, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.