U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 12, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • December 01, 2016: [Transport Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 28, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • September 15, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 15, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 15, 2016: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Request]
  • January 20, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 20, 2016: [Request]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 09, 2015: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2015: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 04, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Arrest - Other District]
  • November 30, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.