U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:02-cr-30120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagle Chasing
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 20, 2016: [Transcript]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 05, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 30, 2015: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 29, 2015: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2015: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 10, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 10, 2015: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 10, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 04, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 04, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 04, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 03, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.