U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Meza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 19, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 02, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 27, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 20, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 20, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • May 23, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 07, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 05, 2016: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • March 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 07, 2016: [Request]
  • January 07, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 06, 2016: [Request]
  • January 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 06, 2016: [Interpreter Needed]
  • January 05, 2016: [Bail Report]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2015: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 14, 2015: [Arrest - Other District]
  • December 10, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.