U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cr-40015-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Duran et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Request for Early Termination]
  • June 12, 2018: [Request for Early Termination]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 17, 2016: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 17, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 10, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 23, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 23, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.