U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guerue
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 10, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 02, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 28, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 27, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 27, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 20, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 11, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 03, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 24, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 18, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 13, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 12, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 12, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 05, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 05, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 23, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 26, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 26, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • October 26, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 08, 2015: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.