U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bordeaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 05, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 24, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 23, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 23, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 02, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 14, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 14, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 11, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 03, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 03, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 07, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 10, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 21, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 19, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 22, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • July 22, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 22, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 19, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [Verdict]
  • July 13, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 13, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • July 13, 2016: [Verdict]
  • July 13, 2016: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 13, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 12, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 12, 2016: [Jury List]
  • July 12, 2016: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 12, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 11, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 11, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 08, 2016: [Witness List]
  • July 05, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 05, 2016: [Brief]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice]
  • July 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 05, 2016: [In Limine]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2016: [Consent]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order]
  • December 22, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 18, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 18, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 14, 2015: [Request]
  • December 14, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 11, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 11, 2015: [Request]
  • December 11, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 11, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 11, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.