U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagle Thunder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 11, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 04, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 02, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 29, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 29, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 26, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 12, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 23, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 23, 2017: [Letter]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 11, 2017: [Furlough]
  • May 09, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 02, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Sentencing]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 31, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 03, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 03, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 21, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 18, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 17, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 17, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 17, 2015: [Arrest]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 17, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 17, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 14, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 14, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2015: [Request]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.