U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dion
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 20, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 06, 2020: [Extend]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 19, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 19, 2020: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • February 19, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • February 19, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 19, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 19, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 13, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 26, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 08, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Order]
  • May 04, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 02, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 02, 2016: [Arrest]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 29, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 29, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 29, 2016: [Request]
  • April 29, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.