U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-10048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nelson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 17, 2016: [Sentencing]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 19, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • September 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 22, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 21, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 28, 2015: [Request]
  • December 23, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 17, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 16, 2015: [Redacted Document]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • December 16, 2015: [Arrest]
  • December 15, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 15, 2015: [Request]
  • December 15, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 15, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 15, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 15, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.