U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-10047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bobtail Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 07, 2019: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
September, 2018
  • September 15, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 15, 2018: [Transcript]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 06, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 10, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 09, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 11, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 04, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 01, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 09, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 09, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 06, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 28, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 13, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 13, 2016: [Departure]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 19, 2016: [Consent]
  • February 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 27, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 15, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 15, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 15, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order]
  • December 15, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 11, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 11, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2015: [Request]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.