U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lange
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • August 01, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 19, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 08, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 08, 2016: [Variance]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 18, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 18, 2016: [Consent]
  • March 18, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 18, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 16, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 16, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 16, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 11, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 11, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.