U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. One Star
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 05, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 02, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 02, 2023: [Text Order]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • December 12, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • February 23, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 04, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 28, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 28, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 25, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 18, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 29, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 29, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 24, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 27, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 23, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 16, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 08, 2016: [Judgment - Amended]
  • November 07, 2016: [Restitution Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Brief]
  • September 30, 2016: [Request]
  • September 30, 2016: [Restitution Related Document]
  • September 28, 2016: [Restitution Related Document]
  • September 28, 2016: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 16, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 15, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 18, 2016: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 18, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 11, 2016: [Furlough]
  • May 05, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 04, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 25, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 20, 2016: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 11, 2016: [Furlough]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 25, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 25, 2016: [Extend]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order]
  • February 02, 2016: [Stipulation]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Request]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 23, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 23, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 23, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 23, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 23, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 23, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 23, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 23, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 23, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2015: [Request]
  • December 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 11, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.