U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sherwood
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • May 01, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 17, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 17, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 17, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 16, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 16, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 16, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 16, 2016: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 16, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 26, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 26, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2016: [Information - Misdemeanor]
  • April 19, 2016: [Variance]
  • April 14, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Order]
  • March 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order]
  • March 02, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 02, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 01, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 01, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Request]
  • December 31, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 17, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 17, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 17, 2015: [Request]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 17, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 17, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 17, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 17, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 10, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • December 09, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.