U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Small Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 12, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 30, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 30, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 21, 2016: [Consent]
  • March 21, 2016: [Leave to]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order]
  • January 21, 2016: [Consent]
  • January 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 14, 2016: [Request]
  • January 12, 2016: [Request]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 07, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 15, 2015: [Request]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 11, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 11, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 11, 2015: [Request]
  • December 11, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 11, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 11, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.