U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gunhammer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Request for Early Termination]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • July 25, 2018: [Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • July 25, 2018: [Request for Early Termination]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 13, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 13, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • June 13, 2016: [Sentencing]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 18, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Continue]
  • April 20, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2016: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 07, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 07, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 26, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order]
  • January 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 11, 2016: [Request]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 23, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 23, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 23, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 23, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 23, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 23, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 23, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 23, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 23, 2015: [Request]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 10, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.