U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Curley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 23, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 08, 2018: [Furlough]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • February 08, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 19, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 03, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2016: [Sentencing]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 26, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 12, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 12, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 11, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 27, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Order]
  • December 18, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 15, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 11, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 11, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 11, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 11, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2015: [Arrest]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 11, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 11, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 11, 2015: [Request]
  • December 11, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 11, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 11, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.