U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 10, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 09, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 09, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 09, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 15, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2016: [Extend]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 02, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 18, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 18, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 18, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order]
  • December 18, 2015: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 17, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 15, 2015: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2015: [Arrest]
  • December 11, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 11, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 11, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2015: [Request]
  • December 11, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 11, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 11, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.