U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black Spotted Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 10, 2023: [Transcript - Restricted]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 06, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 30, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 27, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 01, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 01, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 23, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 14, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 14, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 07, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 19, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 19, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 19, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 12, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • April 11, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 25, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 24, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 02, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 10, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 10, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 10, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 10, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 10, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2015: [Arrest]
  • December 10, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 10, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2015: [Request]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 09, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 09, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 09, 2015: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.