U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nelson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 20, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 20, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 31, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 12, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 24, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 24, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 11, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 09, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 25, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • February 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 24, 2016: [Oral Order]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 19, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 19, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 07, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 07, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 06, 2016: [Request]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 04, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 04, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.