U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-50106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lamont
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 18, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 09, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 30, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 20, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 02, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 02, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 16, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 11, 2015: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 11, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 09, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 09, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.