U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. One Feather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 11, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 26, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • April 23, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 24, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 19, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 17, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 15, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 12, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 06, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 06, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 06, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 06, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 06, 2016: [Allocution Statement]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 10, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 10, 2015: [Waiver]
  • December 10, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 10, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.