U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lindberg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 15, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 12, 2016: [Variance]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 13, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Response]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 16, 2015: [Discovery]
  • December 15, 2015: [Request]
  • December 15, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 11, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 11, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 11, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2015: [Arrest]
  • December 11, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.