U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-10046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 23, 2025: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 15, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 25, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 23, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 17, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 09, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2016: [Consent]
  • June 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Consent]
  • January 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2016: [Request]
  • January 04, 2016: [Remark]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 17, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 15, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order]
  • December 15, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 15, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 14, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2015: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.