U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-50010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Old Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 20, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 15, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • April 05, 2016: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Allocution Statement]
  • January 26, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 15, 2015: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 15, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 15, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.