U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Berry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 16, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 11, 2016: [Transcript]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 02, 2016: [Suppress]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 21, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 17, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 16, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2015: [Oral Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment]
  • December 15, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.