U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50158-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coleman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • September 28, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 18, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 24, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 13, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2016: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 17, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 17, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 17, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 16, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 14, 2016: [Request]
  • January 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 13, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 13, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 11, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 11, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2016: [Arrest]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.