U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Two Bulls
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 08, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 23, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 21, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 20, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 19, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 18, 2016: [Variance]
  • May 17, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 12, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 12, 2016: [Waiver]
  • February 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 04, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 04, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 04, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 04, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 12, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 08, 2016: [Reconsideration]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 22, 2015: [Request]
  • December 22, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 21, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 18, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 18, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.