U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mejia-Alvarado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 29, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 28, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2016: [Allocution Statement]
  • January 05, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 18, 2015: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 18, 2015: [Consent]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 18, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 18, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 16, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment]
  • December 15, 2015: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 15, 2015: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.