U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bull Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 03, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 03, 2021: [Consent]
  • December 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 03, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 25, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 25, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 15, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • May 29, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 29, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • May 29, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 14, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 26, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • March 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2017: [Request]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 17, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 17, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2017: [Arrest]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.