U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Klug
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 19, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 14, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 13, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 07, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 07, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 05, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 08, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 08, 2016: [Waiver]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 16, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 16, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 16, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 16, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 03, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 08, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 08, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.