U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 04, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 08, 2018: [Furlough]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 23, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 21, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • February 20, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • February 20, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 20, 2018: [Request for Warrant]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 24, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 24, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 29, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 09, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 09, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 03, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 03, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 13, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 12, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.