U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-30085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dillon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 12, 2022: [Consent]
  • April 12, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 12, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 06, 2022: [Consent]
  • January 04, 2022: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 12, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 10, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 04, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 14, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 10, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • May 03, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • May 03, 2019: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 03, 2019: [Request for Summons]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 13, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 13, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 18, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 11, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 04, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2017: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Modifying Supervised Release]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 01, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 07, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 22, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.