U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagle Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 15, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 07, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 01, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 01, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.