U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Steele et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 08, 2024: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Transcript]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • March 05, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [USCA Order]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • November 16, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • January 21, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 21, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 21, 2018: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • January 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 21, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 19, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 18, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 11, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 08, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 08, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 29, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • December 11, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 11, 2017: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 11, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 07, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 04, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 01, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 22, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 16, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 15, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 14, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • September 19, 2017: [Request]
  • September 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 19, 2017: [New Trial]
  • September 18, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 15, 2017: [Objection]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Transcript]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Verdict]
  • June 09, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • June 09, 2017: [Response to Jury Question]
  • June 09, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • June 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 09, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 09, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 07, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • June 06, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 06, 2017: [Jury List]
  • June 06, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 02, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 19, 2017: [In Limine]
  • May 12, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • May 11, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 11, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 08, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2017
  • April 29, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • April 29, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 29, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [Stipulation]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice]
  • March 14, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • March 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 02, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 02, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 02, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • February 23, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 14, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 03, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • January 26, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 20, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 16, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 08, 2016: [Transcript]
November, 2016
  • November 27, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 27, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 17, 2016: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 16, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 10, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 10, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 25, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 24, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 21, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 21, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 20, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 17, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2016: [Downward Departure]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 14, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 04, 2016: [Sentencing]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2016: [Departure]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 16, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 15, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 09, 2016: [Response]
  • August 05, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 02, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 29, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 25, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 22, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 22, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 21, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 21, 2016: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 19, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • July 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 08, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 08, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 07, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 22, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2016: [Continue]
  • June 17, 2016: [Consent]
  • June 17, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 02, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 02, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 02, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 27, 2016: [Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 27, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 24, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 24, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 19, 2016: [Joinder]
  • May 15, 2016: [Joinder]
  • May 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • May 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 10, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • May 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 04, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2016: [Extend]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 29, 2016: [Consent]
  • April 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 26, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 22, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 22, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 22, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 22, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 22, 2016: [Consent]
  • April 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 21, 2016: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 15, 2016: [Search & Seizure Warrant Issued]
  • April 15, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 15, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2016: [Application for Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 14, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 14, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 14, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 14, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2016: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • March 02, 2016: [Consent]
  • March 02, 2016: [Objection]
  • March 01, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 01, 2016: [Consent]
  • March 01, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Notice]
  • February 23, 2016: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • February 23, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 22, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 05, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2016: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 03, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 03, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 03, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 03, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 03, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 03, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 03, 2016: [Transcript]
  • February 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 02, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 01, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 01, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 27, 2016: [Text Order]
  • January 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • January 27, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • January 19, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 06, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 04, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 04, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Objection]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • December 28, 2015: [Continue]
  • December 28, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 28, 2015: [Quash]
  • December 28, 2015: [Request]
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 23, 2015: [For Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 23, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 23, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 23, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 23, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 23, 2015: [Request]
  • December 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 23, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 23, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 23, 2015: [Arrest]
  • December 22, 2015: [Request]
  • December 22, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 21, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 21, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 18, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 18, 2015: [Arrest]
  • December 18, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.