U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Big Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 29, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 01, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 17, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • March 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 08, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 19, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2016: [Consent]
  • February 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Order]
  • January 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Request]
  • December 31, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 29, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 29, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 29, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 29, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 29, 2015: [Arrest]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 29, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 29, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 29, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 29, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.